The 8th Infantry Division, ("Pathfinder") was an infantry division of the United States Army during the 20th century. The division served in World War I, World War II, and Operation Desert Storm. Initially activated in January 1918, the unit did not see combat during World War I and returned to the United States. Some units would serve in the American Expeditionary Force to Siberia. Activated again on 1 July 1940 as part of the build-up of military forces prior to the United States' entry into World War II, the division saw extensive action in the European Theatre of Operations. Following World War II, the division was moved to West Germany, where it remained stationed at the Rose Barracks in Bad Kreuznach until it was inactivated on 17 January 1992.
Activated: January 1918
Overseas: November 1918
Commanders:
Col. Elmore F. Taggart (5 January – 14 February 1918)
Col. G. L. Van Deusen (15–24 February 1918)
Brig. Gen. Joseph D. Leitch (25 February – 9 March 1918; 18 March–17 July 1918; 4–10 August 1918; 12 August – 1 September 1918 )
Maj. Gen. John Frank Morrison (10–17 March 1918)
Maj. Gen. William S. Graves (18 July – 3 August 1918; 11 August 1918)
Maj. Gen. Eli A. Helmick (2 September 1918 – 19 November 1918; 26 November 1918 –)
Brig. Gen. John J. Bradley (20–26 November 1918)
The 8th Division was organized at Camp Fremont, California, from men of the Regular Army, 3 August 1918.
Headquarters, 8th Division
15th Infantry Brigade
12th Infantry Regiment
62nd Infantry Regiment
23rd Machine Gun Battalion
16th Infantry Brigade
8th Infantry Regiment
13th Infantry Regiment
24th Machine Gun Battalion
8th Field Artillery Brigade
2nd Field Artillery Regiment (155 mm)
81st Field Artillery Regiment (75 mm)
83rd Field Artillery Regiment (75 mm)
8th Trench Mortar Battery
22nd Machine Gun Battalion
319th Engineer Regiment
320th Field Signal Battalion
Headquarters Troop, 8th Division
8th Train Headquarters and Military Police
8th Ammunition Train
8th Supply Train
8th Engineer Train
8th Sanitary Train
11th, 31st, 32nd, and 43rd Ambulance Companies and Field Hospitals
Major General Graves, with his staff, 5000 men, and 100 officers, transferred to Siberia in August 1918 to occupy the city of Vladivostok in Russia as part of the intervention in the Russian Civil War, and Major General Eli A.